THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 13:34:29 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary A. Rosenthal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary A. Rosenthal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Feb 2024
Summary of Decision:
On February 5, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Rosenthal engaged in sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by touching Patient A in a sexual manner during a medical appointment and having a sexual relationship with Patient B while continuing to treat her.

The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Rosenthal attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Rosenthal’s certificate of registration effective February 6, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.;
  3. Dr. Rosenthal pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 6, 2024.
  4. Dr. Rosenthal reimburse the College $35,880 for funding provided for therapy and counselling under s. 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of these amounts within thirty (30) days of this Order.
OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at tribunal@opsdt.ca.   
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; Feb 05, 2024

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 26 May 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gary Alan Rosenthal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 26, 2022:   
 
The College has received a public complaint regarding Dr. Rosenthal’s conduct and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal:

Dr. Rosenthal must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional approved by the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Rosenthal’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For professional encounters occurring in an Operating Room or Endoscopy suite, a monitor who is a regulated health professional approved by the College must be present in the location to verify that Dr. Rosenthal is not alone at any time with any patient.

For further clarity, Dr. Rosenthal must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Rosenthal shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in his office Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Rosenthal must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Rosenthal must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”. Dr. Rosenthal is not required to post a sign in the hospital setting.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 05 Feb 2024
Summary of Decision:
On February 5, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Rosenthal engaged in sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by touching Patient A in a sexual manner during a medical appointment and having a sexual relationship with Patient B while continuing to treat her.

The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Rosenthal attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Rosenthal’s certificate of registration effective February 6, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.;
  3. Dr. Rosenthal pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by March 6, 2024.
  4. Dr. Rosenthal reimburse the College $35,880 for funding provided for therapy and counselling under s. 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of these amounts within thirty (30) days of this Order.
OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at tribunal@opsdt.ca.   
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; Feb 05, 2024

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 26 May 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gary Alan Rosenthal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 26, 2022:   
 
The College has received a public complaint regarding Dr. Rosenthal’s conduct and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Tribunal:

Dr. Rosenthal must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional approved by the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Rosenthal’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For professional encounters occurring in an Operating Room or Endoscopy suite, a monitor who is a regulated health professional approved by the College must be present in the location to verify that Dr. Rosenthal is not alone at any time with any patient.

For further clarity, Dr. Rosenthal must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Rosenthal shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in his office Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Rosenthal must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Rosenthal must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”. Dr. Rosenthal is not required to post a sign in the hospital setting.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 06 Feb 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1986
DETAILS: Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 May 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1986