THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Email: to [email protected]
Tel: (613) 728-3808
Date Received: 30 Apr 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Email: to [email protected]
Tel: (613) 728-3808
Date Received: 30 Apr 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1987