THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:39:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiation Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 64706
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 27 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Whitton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiation Oncology
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Extension: 64706
Fax: (905) 575-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 27 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Whitton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHARLES WHITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY CHARLES WHITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 1987