THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-6641
Fax: (905) 737-8285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, YIDDISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-6641
Fax: (905) 737-8285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC WOLFE GANGBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGBAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC WOLFE GANGBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANGBAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987