THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:43:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Oct 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert S. Lepage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lepage (CPSO#: 58016 )
Business Address: 3500 Skyline Drive
Garson Ontario P3L 1V4
(705) 670-0333
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-4120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Espanola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 869-1420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Oct 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert S. Lepage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lepage (CPSO#: 58016 )
Business Address: 3500 Skyline Drive
Garson Ontario P3L 1V4
(705) 670-0333
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-4120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT STEPHEN LEPAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT STEPHEN LEPAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEPAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987