THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:31:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
413 Main Street
Mahone Bay Nova Scotia B0J 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9026248373
Fax: 9026241524

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records are being stored at the above location.
Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. (RSRS)
1-888-563-3732, ext. 1
Date Received: 31 Jan 2018

Instructions/Address: Patients wishing to obtain copies of Dr. Keeton's medical records should contact Dr. Keeton by telephone at: 905-528-5858, or by fax: 905-388-5069.
Date Received: 31 Oct 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
413 Main Street
Mahone Bay Nova Scotia B0J 2E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9026248373
Fax: 9026241524

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records are being stored at the above location.
Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. (RSRS)
1-888-563-3732, ext. 1
Date Received: 31 Jan 2018

Instructions/Address: Patients wishing to obtain copies of Dr. Keeton's medical records should contact Dr. Keeton by telephone at: 905-528-5858, or by fax: 905-388-5069.
Date Received: 31 Oct 2017

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA HELEN KEETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA HELEN KEETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Jul 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Jul 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987