THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan (CPSO#: 58058 )
Business Address: 145 Queenston Street
Suite 305
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z9
(905) 685-5506

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan (CPSO#: 58058 )
Business Address: 145 Queenston Street
Suite 305
St Catharines Ontario L2R 2Z9
(905) 685-5506

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987