THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:02:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3095 Glen Erin Dr.
suite 4
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-1046
Fax: (905) 820-1899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3095 Glen Erin Dr.
suite 4
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 820-1046
Fax: (905) 820-1899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Dec 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA MARCHETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHETTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA MARCHETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHETTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987