THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 04:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 05 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 10 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 05 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987