THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:45:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Listowel Clinic
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: A. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2021

Corporation Name: Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Listowel Clinic
185 Inkerman Street East
Listowel Ontario N4W 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 291-4200
Fax: (519) 291-5947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: A. Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2021

Corporation Name: Qureshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIF SIKANDAR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIF SIKANDAR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987