THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:14:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600-3535 Ch Queen-Mary
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (438) 803-5434
Fax: (438) 858-2077
Address: 292-1605 Boul Marcel-Laurin
Saint-Laurent QC H4R 0B7
Phone: (514) 866-5005
Fax: (514) 687-7510

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 23 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600-3535 Ch Queen-Mary
Montréal QC H3V 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (438) 803-5434
Fax: (438) 858-2077
Address: 292-1605 Boul Marcel-Laurin
Saint-Laurent QC H4R 0B7
Phone: (514) 866-5005
Fax: (514) 687-7510

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 23 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA VENKATARANGAM JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA VENKATARANGAM JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987