THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 329-1834
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 329-1834
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987