THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 772 Princess Street
Princess Street Medical Centre
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-477-0163
Fax: 613-544-7247
Address: 8-105 Sutherland Drive
CDK Family Medicine
Kingston Ontario K7K 5V6
Phone: 613-766-0318
Extension: 700
Fax: 613-766-0339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rex Verschuren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verschuren (CPSO#: 58317 )
Business Address: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Address: 8-105 Sutherland Drive
Kingston Ontario K7K 5V6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, DUTCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 772 Princess Street
Princess Street Medical Centre
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-477-0163
Fax: 613-544-7247
Address: 8-105 Sutherland Drive
CDK Family Medicine
Kingston Ontario K7K 5V6
Phone: 613-766-0318
Extension: 700
Fax: 613-766-0339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rex Verschuren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verschuren (CPSO#: 58317 )
Business Address: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Address: 8-105 Sutherland Drive
Kingston Ontario K7K 5V6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REX EDWARD VERSCHUREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERSCHUREN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REX EDWARD VERSCHUREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERSCHUREN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987