THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:24:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Quinton-Gladstone, Cindy Lee (Used Until: 08 Feb 2015)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
4th floor
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Address: Trillium Health Partners
4th floor Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: Quinton-Gladstone, Cindy Lee (Used Until: 08 Feb 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
4th floor
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Address: Trillium Health Partners
4th floor Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Extension: 5135
Fax: (905) 813-4024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY LEE QUINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY LEE QUINTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987