THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bldg. C
4 - 3000 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-5866
Fax: (416) 439-8776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Colwill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Colwill (CPSO#: 58335 )
Business Address: Suite C-04
3000 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V1
(416) 439-5866

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bldg. C
4 - 3000 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-5866
Fax: (416) 439-8776

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Colwill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Colwill (CPSO#: 58335 )
Business Address: Suite C-04
3000 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V1
(416) 439-5866

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WAYNE COLWILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLWILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WAYNE COLWILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLWILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of April 2, 2018, Dr. Colwill completed the requirements of his SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jul 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of April 2, 2018, Dr. Colwill completed the requirements of his SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987