THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:56:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be sent to:
2221 Gratton Trail
Westmeath, Ontario
K0J 2L0
Email [email protected]
Phone number 1-613-852-8196

Date Received: 28 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted Schnare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be sent to:
2221 Gratton Trail
Westmeath, Ontario
K0J 2L0
Email [email protected]
Phone number 1-613-852-8196

Date Received: 28 Sep 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ted Schnare Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987