THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:02:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Oct 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Gerald Barnes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2017:

Dr. BARNES has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Oct 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Gerald Barnes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 28, 2017:

Dr. BARNES has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987