THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Columbia University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 309
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-0800
Fax: (905) 201-0018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Columbia University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 309
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-0800
Fax: (905) 201-0018

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 16 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE LAWRENCE LEWTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWTAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE LAWRENCE LEWTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWTAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Columbia University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987