THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5468 Dundas Street West
Suite 104B
Toronto Ontario
M9B 6E3
Toronto Ontario M9C 2Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-626-9222
Fax: 416-626-9205

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Judah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5468 Dundas Street West
Suite 104B
Toronto Ontario
M9B 6E3
Toronto Ontario M9C 2Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-626-9222
Fax: 416-626-9205

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Judah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 May 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Discipline Committee
10 Apr 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Discipline Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 10 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., April 10, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eli
Judah:

a) Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from administering parenteral
sedation;
b) With the exception of hair transplant procedures, Dr. Judah shall
be prohibited from performing cosmetic surgical procedures;
c) Dr. Judah's performance of hair transplant procedures shall be in
accordance with any and all conditions and dispositions made by the
Premises Inspection Committee of the College; and
d) Dr. Judah shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his
practice and such other steps as the College may take for the
purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms
of the Order at his expense.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 11:59 p.m., April 10, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eli
Judah:

a) Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from administering parenteral
sedation;
b) With the exception of hair transplant procedures, Dr. Judah shall
be prohibited from performing cosmetic surgical procedures;
c) Dr. Judah's performance of hair transplant procedures shall be in
accordance with any and all conditions and dispositions made by the
Premises Inspection Committee of the College; and
d) Dr. Judah shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his
practice and such other steps as the College may take for the
purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms
of the Order at his expense.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Apr 2012
Summary of Decision:
On April 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eli Judah committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.The Committee also found that Dr. Judah is incompetent. Dr. Judah admitted to the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.

Dr. Judah is a general practitioner who, at the time of the events at issue, performed cosmetic surgery at his clinic. Dr. Judah completed three years of surgical training in a residency program,but does not have a Royal College certification in a surgical specialty. Dr. Judah admits to the following deficiencies identified in his cosmetic surgery practice:

a) Dr. Judah failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of 29 cosmetic surgical patients in the following ways:

i) he failed to employ staff with appropriate training;
ii) he failed to administer IV sedation in the presence of a qualified anaesthesiologist;
iii) in respect of some of his patients, he failed to properly store harvested fat that he later injected;
iv) he excessively sedated patients during surgery; and
v) he performed combined surgery on an unsuitable candidate.

b) Dr. Judah is incompetent in that his professional care of patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment in the following ways:

i) he used IV sedation in the absence of a qualified anaesthesiologist;
ii) he directed the use of IV sedation while also being responsible for performing the surgery;
iii) he lacks training in administering IV sedation; and
iv) he lacks knowledge and judgment in IV sedation.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Judah's certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from administering parenteral sedation;
b) With the exception of hair transplant procedures, Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from performing cosmetic surgical procedures;
c) Dr. Judah's performance of hair transplant procedures shall be in accordance with any and all conditions and dispositions made by the Premises Inspection Committee of the College; and
d) Dr. Judah shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order at his expense.

2. Dr. Judah appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Judah pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 10, 2012

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 10 Apr 2012
Summary of Decision:
On April 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Eli Judah committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.The Committee also found that Dr. Judah is incompetent. Dr. Judah admitted to the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence.

Dr. Judah is a general practitioner who, at the time of the events at issue, performed cosmetic surgery at his clinic. Dr. Judah completed three years of surgical training in a residency program,but does not have a Royal College certification in a surgical specialty. Dr. Judah admits to the following deficiencies identified in his cosmetic surgery practice:

a) Dr. Judah failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care and treatment of 29 cosmetic surgical patients in the following ways:

i) he failed to employ staff with appropriate training;
ii) he failed to administer IV sedation in the presence of a qualified anaesthesiologist;
iii) in respect of some of his patients, he failed to properly store harvested fat that he later injected;
iv) he excessively sedated patients during surgery; and
v) he performed combined surgery on an unsuitable candidate.

b) Dr. Judah is incompetent in that his professional care of patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment in the following ways:

i) he used IV sedation in the absence of a qualified anaesthesiologist;
ii) he directed the use of IV sedation while also being responsible for performing the surgery;
iii) he lacks training in administering IV sedation; and
iv) he lacks knowledge and judgment in IV sedation.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Judah's certificate of registration:

a) Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from administering parenteral sedation;
b) With the exception of hair transplant procedures, Dr. Judah shall be prohibited from performing cosmetic surgical procedures;
c) Dr. Judah's performance of hair transplant procedures shall be in accordance with any and all conditions and dispositions made by the Premises Inspection Committee of the College; and
d) Dr. Judah shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order at his expense.

2. Dr. Judah appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. Dr. Judah pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 10, 2012

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1987