THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:56:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Byward Family Health Team
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Address: 717 Boulevard St-Joseph ,suite 106
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 4B6
Phone: 819-525-7025
Fax: 819-525-7300
Address: West Nipissing General hospital
725 chemin Coursol
Sturgeons Falls Ontario
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Phone: 705-753-2271
Fax: 705-753-4202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Byward Family Health Team
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
Address: 717 Boulevard St-Joseph ,suite 106
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 4B6
Phone: 819-525-7025
Fax: 819-525-7300
Address: West Nipissing General hospital
725 chemin Coursol
Sturgeons Falls Ontario
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Phone: 705-753-2271
Fax: 705-753-4202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE J NADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE J NADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 May 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dominique J Nadon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 9, 2016:

Dr. Nadon was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Nadon relinquished prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations and monitored drugs.
• Dr. Nadon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Nadon will engage in professional education in Polypharmacology.
• Dr. Nadon’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 09 May 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dominique J Nadon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 9, 2016:

Dr. Nadon was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Nadon relinquished prescribing narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations and monitored drugs.
• Dr. Nadon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
• Dr. Nadon will engage in professional education in Polypharmacology.
• Dr. Nadon’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 06 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 03 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 09 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987