THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:52:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Princess St.
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-0555
Fax: (613) 546-4487

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 22 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Princess St.
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-0555
Fax: (613) 546-4487

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 22 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DOMINIQUE BROUILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROUILLARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DOMINIQUE BROUILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROUILLARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987