THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The ArborVitae Clinic
Kingston
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-417-3373
Fax: 1-343-888-2194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The ArborVitae Clinic
Kingston
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-417-3373
Fax: 1-343-888-2194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Aug 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEVERLY JOAN GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEVERLY JOAN GOODWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOODWIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987