THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:57:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1701 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean Sports Medicine and Physiotherapy Centre
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-727-5755
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Tremblay Rd
Ottawa ON K1G 3J8
Phone: 613-437-7018
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bermuda
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1701 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean Sports Medicine and Physiotherapy Centre
Nepean ON K2G 1W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-727-5755
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Tremblay Rd
Ottawa ON K1G 3J8
Phone: 613-437-7018
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bermuda
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL RICHARD CERVENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERVENKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL RICHARD CERVENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CERVENKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987