THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:39:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Palermo, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: COSTI Family and Mental Health Services
Sheridan Mall
105 - 1700 Wilson Ave
P.O. Box 90
Toronto, ON M3L 1B2
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Palermo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: COSTI Family and Mental Health Services
Sheridan Mall
105 - 1700 Wilson Ave
P.O. Box 90
Toronto, ON M3L 1B2
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Palermo, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 05 Feb 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987