THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:38:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Czolpinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Czolpinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TADEUSZ RYSZARD CZOLPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZOLPINSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TADEUSZ RYSZARD CZOLPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZOLPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1987