THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:10:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: "A copy of a patient's chart may be requested by emailing [email protected]."
Date Received: 01 Oct 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fernandez Marion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: "A copy of a patient's chart may be requested by emailing [email protected]."
Date Received: 01 Oct 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fernandez Marion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1986