THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:48:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
3rd floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
3rd floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSARIO BRIONES-URBINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIONES-URBINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSARIO BRIONES-URBINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIONES-URBINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1987