THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:36:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kerry MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 09 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 May 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kerry MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1987