THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:06:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Prichard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Prichard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jul 2014

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1987