THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:28:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 26 Oct 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2001

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1987