THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:18:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Radiology Consultants of Winnipeg
Medical Arts Building
Suite 202
233 Kennedy Street
Winnipeg Manitoba R3C 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Radiology Consultants of Winnipeg
Medical Arts Building
Suite 202
233 Kennedy Street
Winnipeg Manitoba R3C 3J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY EARL MARANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY EARL MARANTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARANTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2023
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 1987