THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:45:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1717 Saint Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-523-5550
Fax: 613-523-5580

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1717 Saint Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1G 3V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-523-5550
Fax: 613-523-5580

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
23 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 23 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Agnes Marie Jeanne Tanguay may practise medicine independently in General/Family medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Agnes Marie Jeanne Tanguay may practise medicine independently in General/Family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Nov 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1988
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 1988