THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1980
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 15 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Instructions/Address: 13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Contact Dina
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Phone: 416-471-8649
Date Received: 02 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Panzini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 15 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd.
Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free:
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019

Instructions/Address: 13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Contact Dina
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Phone: 416-471-8649
Date Received: 02 Apr 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Panzini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRIETTE PANZINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANZINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRIETTE PANZINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANZINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1988