THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alberto Casses Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Casses (CPSO#: 59271 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alberto Casses Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Casses (CPSO#: 59271 )

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Apr 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1988