THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:41:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Suite 104
316 George Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 336-6765
Fax: (519) 336-7319
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia,ON
N7T 6S3
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5517
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Suite 104
316 George Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 336-6765
Fax: (519) 336-7319
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia,ON
N7T 6S3
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5517
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 04 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH M YOSHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOSHIDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH M YOSHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOSHIDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 1988