THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:40:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 330 Université Ave
3rd floor
Moncton NB E1C 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 506 862 4177
Fax: 506 862 4325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 330 Université Ave
3rd floor
Moncton NB E1C 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 506 862 4177
Fax: 506 862 4325

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Oct 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE BOUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 18 Dec 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1995

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988