THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:08:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 236
1186 Richards Street
Richards Landing ON P0R 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-246-2477
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 278 Front Street
Hornepayne Ontario P0M 1Z0
Phone: (807) 868-2442
Extension: 230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Hornepayne Community Hospital
LOCATION: Hornepayne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 236
1186 Richards Street
Richards Landing ON P0R 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-246-2477
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 278 Front Street
Hornepayne Ontario P0M 1Z0
Phone: (807) 868-2442
Extension: 230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Mar 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Hornepayne Community Hospital
LOCATION: Hornepayne

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 13 Dec 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988