THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:41:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.J. D'Addario Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.J. D'Addario Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 08 Oct 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Public Service, Federal Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 1989

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Public Service, Federal Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988