THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:03:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Middlegate Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-804-7000
Fax: 905-804-2250
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-804-7735
Fax: 905-804-7736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Middlegate Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-804-7000
Fax: 905-804-2250
Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-804-7735
Fax: 905-804-7736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE LE FEUVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE FEUVRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE LE FEUVRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE FEUVRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988