THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:00:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Dec 2014
Summary:
Dr. Kelly was referred to the Discipline Committee by way of Notice of Hearing on May 17, 2005, on allegations that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by being in possession of electronic images of child pornography. Effective December 24, 2014, Dr. Kelly has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Dr. Kelly does not admit the allegations and does not admit any fault or liability. Given Dr. Kelly’s resignation and undertaking not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction, the College has withdrawn the Notice of Hearing.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 24 Dec 2014
Summary:
Dr. Kelly was referred to the Discipline Committee by way of Notice of Hearing on May 17, 2005, on allegations that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by being in possession of electronic images of child pornography. Effective December 24, 2014, Dr. Kelly has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Dr. Kelly does not admit the allegations and does not admit any fault or liability. Given Dr. Kelly’s resignation and undertaking not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction, the College has withdrawn the Notice of Hearing.

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988