THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Birchwood Avenue
Burlington Ontario L7T 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-308-1067
Fax: No Information Available
Address: George Town Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Milton District Hsopital
7030 Derry Raod
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 955 Birchwood Avenue
Burlington Ontario L7T 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-308-1067
Fax: No Information Available
Address: George Town Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Milton District Hsopital
7030 Derry Raod
Milton Ontario L9T 7H6
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marotta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM MAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT WILLIAM MAROTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAROTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988