THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:35:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 325 Wellington Street North
McMaster Children's Hospital
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 72880
Fax: 9055217968
Address: Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 325 Wellington Street North
McMaster Children's Hospital
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8L 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Extension: 72880
Fax: 9055217968
Address: Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERRY ELLEN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERRY ELLEN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988