THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy/transfer of their medical records from December 31, 2018, onwards can contact Dr. Zsolt Toth: Suite 302 – 111 Main Street West, North Bay, ON., P1B 8G4. Telephone: 705-497-0424.

Patients of Dr. Birosh prior to December 31, 2018, can email Dr. Birosh at: [email protected]

Date Received: 27 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Birosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy/transfer of their medical records from December 31, 2018, onwards can contact Dr. Zsolt Toth: Suite 302 – 111 Main Street West, North Bay, ON., P1B 8G4. Telephone: 705-497-0424.

Patients of Dr. Birosh prior to December 31, 2018, can email Dr. Birosh at: [email protected]

Date Received: 27 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Birosh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988