THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:20:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: PO Box 33086
Franklin PO
Cambridge, ON N1R 8R0
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: PO Box 33086
Franklin PO
Cambridge, ON N1R 8R0
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 13 Jun 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Conrad Wozniak to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 13, 2019:

Dr. Wozniak resigned from the College on June 1, 2018. Thereafter, a College Investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Wozniak engaged in professional misconduct in his family practice. Dr. Wozniak has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. No further action was taken on the Investigation further to receipt of this undertaking. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 13 Jun 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Conrad Wozniak to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 13, 2019:

Dr. Wozniak resigned from the College on June 1, 2018. Thereafter, a College Investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Wozniak engaged in professional misconduct in his family practice. Dr. Wozniak has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. No further action was taken on the Investigation further to receipt of this undertaking. 

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988