THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:56:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Urology
Suite 9111
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3686
Fax: (416) 867-3675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 10 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Division of Urology
Suite 9111
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3686
Fax: (416) 867-3675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 10 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988