THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:56:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gianfranco Pietrobon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gianfranco Pietrobon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
29 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective May 29, 2024, Dr. Gianfranco Pietrobon has ceased to practice medicine on an interim basis.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Effective May 29, 2024, Dr. Gianfranco Pietrobon has ceased to practice medicine on an interim basis.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 May 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988