THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 05:40:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 216
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 553-5040
Fax: (289) 553-5042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 216
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 553-5040
Fax: (289) 553-5042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MICHELE FOX THAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA MICHELE FOX THAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988