THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:48:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc (RASCI)
rasci.ca/patientrecordfees

T: 1-800-971-8038 ext 702    F:  1-800-928-2503
Date Received: 17 Apr 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvia Sas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Access Services Canada Inc (RASCI)
rasci.ca/patientrecordfees

T: 1-800-971-8038 ext 702    F:  1-800-928-2503
Date Received: 17 Apr 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvia Sas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Apr 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988