THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:05:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 235 Danforth Ave
Suite 406
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-6440
Fax: (647) 352-6441

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 235 Danforth Ave
Suite 406
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 352-6440
Fax: (647) 352-6441

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GUY BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GUY BLACKMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKMORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1994

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988