THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:08:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-702-1000
Fax: 613-702-1001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-702-1000
Fax: 613-702-1001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD BERGERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERGERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988